TX HR584 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 27, 2011, as Texas Water Conservation Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing April 27, 2011, as Texas Water Conservation Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-03-31 | Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Laid before the House | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-02-23 | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WATER CONSERVATION DAY, TEXAS
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WATER CONSERVATION DAY, TEXAS