TX HR533 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 22, 2017, as Liquefied Natural Gas Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 22, 2017, as Liquefied Natural Gas Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-02-22 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
LIQUEFIED NATURAL GAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates