TX HR528 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Laurie Ezzell Brown for her accomplishments as editor and publisher of the Canadian Record.
Title
Honoring Laurie Ezzell Brown for her accomplishments as editor and publisher of the Canadian Record.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-03-16 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-14 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-08 | House | Filed |