TX HR521 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 2017 as Texas Whole Child Month.
Title
Recognizing April 2017 as Texas Whole Child Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WHOLE CHILD MONTH, TEXAS
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WHOLE CHILD MONTH, TEXAS