TX HR50 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating State Representative Beverly Woolley and Lynn Woolley on their 50th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating State Representative Beverly Woolley and Lynn Woolley on their 50th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | Adopted | |
2011-02-24 | Laid before the House | |
2011-02-24 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-01-04 | Filed |