TX HR499 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Dorothy and James Allen Scott of Jefferson on their 60th wedding anniversary.
Title
Honoring Dorothy and James Allen Scott of Jefferson on their 60th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-26 | Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-02-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-17 | Filed |