TX HR478 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the Lubbock and South Plains Colon Cancer Prevention Task Force for its work to advance colorectal cancer prevention and awareness.
Title
Recognizing the Lubbock and South Plains Colon Cancer Prevention Task Force for its work to advance colorectal cancer prevention and awareness.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
LUBBOCK & SOUTH PLAINS COLON CANCER PREVENTION TASK FORCE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary