TX HR4 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Harriette Martin on her retirement from the Newton County Public Library.
Title
Congratulating Harriette Martin on her retirement from the Newton County Public Library.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-08-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-08-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-08-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-08-30 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-08-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-08-06 | House | Filed |