TX HR396 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 15, 2017, as Garland Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 15, 2017, as Garland Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
GARLAND DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates