TX HR39 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Juli Mathew on her election as judge of Fort Bend County Court at Law No. 3.
Title
Congratulating Juli Mathew on her election as judge of Fort Bend County Court at Law No. 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed |