TX HR345 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Chandler and Franklin Hatchett of Dallas on the birth of their baby boy, Brooks Beall Hatchett.
Title
Congratulating Chandler and Franklin Hatchett of Dallas on the birth of their baby boy, Brooks Beall Hatchett.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HATCHETT, BROOKS BEALL
HATCHETT, CHANDLER & FRANKLIN
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
HATCHETT, CHANDLER & FRANKLIN
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary