TX HR340 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 12, 2013, as Wise County Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 12, 2013, as Wise County Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2013-02-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-02-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WISE COUNTY DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
WISE COUNTY DAY