TX HR2710 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Commemorating the bicentennial in 2010 of the Grito de Dolores, the battle cry issued by Father Miguel Hidalgo y Costilla, the father of Mexican independence and the namesake of Hidalgo County.
Title
Commemorating the bicentennial in 2010 of the Grito de Dolores, the battle cry issued by Father Miguel Hidalgo y Costilla, the father of Mexican independence and the namesake of Hidalgo County.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Pena [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Adopted | |
2009-05-31 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-31 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-29 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-27 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-26 | Filed |