TX HR259 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Mike R. Perez on his retirement as the city manager of Weslaco.
Title
Congratulating Mike R. Perez on his retirement as the city manager of Weslaco.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-18 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-10-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-10-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-15 | House | Filed |