TX HR259 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring J. L. and Sheila Rushing of Indian Rock on their 50th wedding anniversary.
Title
Honoring J. L. and Sheila Rushing of Indian Rock on their 50th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-16 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-26 | Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-02-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-04 | Filed |