TX HR25 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Carl and Patsy Feller of Salado on their 60th wedding anniversary.
Title
Honoring Carl and Patsy Feller of Salado on their 60th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-06 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-06-28 | Adopted | |
2011-06-28 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-06-01 | Filed |