TX HR235 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing January 24-30, 2021, as National Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists Week.
Title
Recognizing January 24-30, 2021, as National Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-03-18 | House | Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CERTIFIED REGISTERED NURSE ANESTHETISTS WEEK, NATIONAL
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates