TX HR235 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 19, 2015, as Stephen F. Austin State University Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 19, 2015, as Stephen F. Austin State University Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
STEPHEN F. AUSTIN STATE UNIVERSITY DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
STEPHEN F. AUSTIN STATE UNIVERSITY DAY