TX HR2332 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Dr. William Gonzaba for his contributions to the health and welfare of the people of San Antonio.
Title
Commending Dr. William Gonzaba for his contributions to the health and welfare of the people of San Antonio.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-24 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-22 | House | Filed |