TX HR2300 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Betty Pittman for serving as Democratic Party precinct chair of Precinct 3200 in Dallas County.
Title
Commending Betty Pittman for serving as Democratic Party precinct chair of Precinct 3200 in Dallas County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-22 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-22 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-21 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-15 | House | Filed |