TX HR23 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing support for the strengthening of our partnership with Taiwan and for the expansion of Taiwan's role on the global stage.
Title
Expressing support for the strengthening of our partnership with Taiwan and for the expansion of Taiwan's role on the global stage.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2018-11-30 | House | Filed |