TX HR229 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Pérez on April 16, 2020, the 49th anniversary of her birth.
Title
Paying tribute to the life of Selena Quintanilla Pérez on April 16, 2020, the 49th anniversary of her birth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |