TX HR2279 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Jeffrey Chatman for his service as legislative director in the office of State Representative Rodney Anderson.
Title
Commending Jeffrey Chatman for his service as legislative director in the office of State Representative Rodney Anderson.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-24 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-19 | House | Filed |