TX HR2250 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring the Texas Child Study Center at Dell Children's Medical Center of Central Texas.
Title
Honoring the Texas Child Study Center at Dell Children's Medical Center of Central Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-25 | Adopted | |
2009-05-25 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-19 | Filed |