TX HR2249 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Linda Fitzner of Gold-Burg High School on her nomination for a 2015 Outstanding Teacher of the Humanities Award from Humanities Texas.
Title
Congratulating Linda Fitzner of Gold-Burg High School on her nomination for a 2015 Outstanding Teacher of the Humanities Award from Humanities Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-23 | House | Filed |