TX HR2231 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the graduates of Parent University at Manuel Jara Elementary School in Fort Worth.
Title
Commending the graduates of Parent University at Manuel Jara Elementary School in Fort Worth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-24 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-17 | House | Filed |