TX HR218 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 12, 2019, as Texas Food & Fuel Association Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 12, 2019, as Texas Food & Fuel Association Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Trent Ashby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
FOOD & FUEL ASSOCIATION DAY, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates