TX HR2177 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Danny Campbell of Chambers County on his selection as one of the "44 Under 40" honorees by the Baytown Sun.
Title
Congratulating Danny Campbell of Chambers County on his selection as one of the "44 Under 40" honorees by the Baytown Sun.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-22 | House | Filed |