TX HR2173 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Gina Dylla on being named 2009 Girls Soccer Coach of the Year by the San Antonio Express-News.
Title
Congratulating Gina Dylla on being named 2009 Girls Soccer Coach of the Year by the San Antonio Express-News.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-21 | Adopted | |
2009-05-21 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-18 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-15 | Filed |