TX HR2157 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Shelly Bullock on her selection as Woman of the Year by the Winnsboro Chamber of Commerce.
Title
Congratulating Shelly Bullock on her selection as Woman of the Year by the Winnsboro Chamber of Commerce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-22 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-22 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-21 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-13 | House | Filed |