TX HR2140 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Welcoming the Honorable Jesus Everardo Villarreal Salinas, mayor of Reynosa, Tamaulipas, Mexico, to the State Capitol.
Title
Welcoming the Honorable Jesus Everardo Villarreal Salinas, mayor of Reynosa, Tamaulipas, Mexico, to the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-16 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-13 | House | Filed |