TX HR2124 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the girls' soccer team from Carroll High School in Southlake on winning the 2019 UIL 6A state championship.
Title
Congratulating the girls' soccer team from Carroll High School in Southlake on winning the 2019 UIL 6A state championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-23 | House | Filed |