TX HR2107 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Juan Carlos Estrada of Rockdale as a participant in the 2013 Moreno/Rangel Legislative Leadership Program.
Title
Honoring Juan Carlos Estrada of Rockdale as a participant in the 2013 Moreno/Rangel Legislative Leadership Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Farias [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-17 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-10 | House | Filed |