TX HR2103 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Amy Hobbie of Crowley on being named Secondary Teacher of the Year by the Association of Texas Professional Educators.
Title
Congratulating Amy Hobbie of Crowley on being named Secondary Teacher of the Year by the Association of Texas Professional Educators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-21 | Adopted | |
2009-05-21 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-18 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-14 | Filed |