TX HR2092 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Miriam M. Elizondo for her service to the Rape Crisis Center in San Antonio.
Title
Honoring Miriam M. Elizondo for her service to the Rape Crisis Center in San Antonio.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-23 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-11 | House | Filed |