TX HR208 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating the Celina High School Bobcats on winning the 3A Division 2 football championship for 2007.
Title
Congratulating the Celina High School Bobcats on winning the 3A Division 2 football championship for 2007.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-16 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-26 | Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-02-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-01-29 | Filed |