TX HR2078 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Officer Scott Kermes on being named the 2009 Officer of the Year by the Plano Police Department.
Title
Congratulating Officer Scott Kermes on being named the 2009 Officer of the Year by the Plano Police Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-26 | Adopted | |
2011-05-26 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-18 | Filed |