TX HR2045 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Ruoheng Zhang on being named the 2009 salutatorian of Sandra Day O'Connor High School in Helotes.
Title
Congratulating Ruoheng Zhang on being named the 2009 salutatorian of Sandra Day O'Connor High School in Helotes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-19 | Adopted | |
2009-05-19 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-15 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-12 | Filed |