TX HR201 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Jenn Ehrlich on being named the 2014 Caregiver of the Year at St. David's Georgetown Hospital.
Title
Congratulating Jenn Ehrlich on being named the 2014 Caregiver of the Year at St. David's Georgetown Hospital.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-01-26 | House | Filed |