TX HR1998 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the dedication of the William G. and Shirley Swenson Home in Abilene as a Recorded Texas Historic Landmark.
Title
Commemorating the dedication of the William G. and Shirley Swenson Home in Abilene as a Recorded Texas Historic Landmark.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-26 | Adopted | |
2011-05-26 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-16 | Filed |