TX HR1988 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Christie Garrett on her selection as the 2019 Teacher of the Year at Kelly Lane Middle School.
Title
Congratulating Christie Garrett on her selection as the 2019 Teacher of the Year at Kelly Lane Middle School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-21 | House | Filed |