TX HR1982 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Sarah Mason Thomas, Ashley Stallard, Nicole Johnson, and Savannah Still of Faith Academy in Marble Falls on winning titles at the 2010 and 2011 TAPPS Tennis State Championships.
Title
Congratulating Sarah Mason Thomas, Ashley Stallard, Nicole Johnson, and Savannah Still of Faith Academy in Marble Falls on winning titles at the 2010 and 2011 TAPPS Tennis State Championships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | Adopted | |
2011-05-24 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-13 | Filed |
Subjects
JOHNSON, NICOLE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
STALLARD, ASHLEY
STILL, SAVANNAH
THOMAS, SARAH MASON
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
STALLARD, ASHLEY
STILL, SAVANNAH
THOMAS, SARAH MASON