TX HR1961 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Pravin Boteju on his receipt of a 2009 Award of Excellence from the Hurst-Euless-Bedford Education Foundation.
Title
Congratulating Pravin Boteju on his receipt of a 2009 Award of Excellence from the Hurst-Euless-Bedford Education Foundation.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-19 | Adopted | |
2009-05-19 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-15 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-08 | Filed |