TX HR1947 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the Fort Worth Metropolitan Black Chamber of Commerce and its PATHS Forward leadership development program.
Title
Honoring the Fort Worth Metropolitan Black Chamber of Commerce and its PATHS Forward leadership development program.
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Veasey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-19 | Adopted | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-11 | Filed |