TX HR1943 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Gruver High School girls' basketball team on advancing to the 2023 UIL 2A state championship game.
Title
Congratulating the Gruver High School girls' basketball team on advancing to the 2023 UIL 2A state championship game.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-23 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-16 | House | Filed |