TX HR1940 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Richard Briley on his retirement as managing director of Health and Code Compliance for the City of Garland.
Title
Congratulating Richard Briley on his retirement as managing director of Health and Code Compliance for the City of Garland.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-09 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-05 | House | Filed |