TX HR1916 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Jesse's Tortilla Factory in Waco on its 50th anniversary in 2008.
Title
Honoring Jesse's Tortilla Factory in Waco on its 50th anniversary in 2008.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-14 | Adopted | |
2009-05-14 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-07 | Filed |