TX HR191 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-10)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-10)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the Armenian genocide.
Title
Recognizing the Armenian genocide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Adopted RV#1354 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed |