TX HR1908 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring former state representative Jim Keffer for his service in the Texas Legislature.
Title
Honoring former state representative Jim Keffer for his service in the Texas Legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-12 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-03 | House | Filed |