TX HR1899 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Lazaro and Margarita Villalobos of Houston on their 25th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Lazaro and Margarita Villalobos of Houston on their 25th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-04 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-10 | House | Filed |